EP0591052 - Method for injecting plugging mud into the tap hole of a metallurgical vessel, such as blast furnace [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
DE
FR
GB
IT
LU
SE
AT
TERRES REFRACTAIRES DU BOULONNAIS B.P. 9, Nesles F-62152 Neufchatel-Hardelot / FR | For:FR
SOLLAC Immeuble Elysées-La Défense, 29 Le Parvis 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | For:BE
DE
FR
GB
IT
LU
SE
AT
TERRES REFRACTAIRES DU BOULONNAIS B.P. 9, Nesles F-62152 Neufchatel-Hardelot / FR | ||
For:FR
SOLLAC Immeuble Elysées-La Défense, 29 Le Parvis F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouttement, Jean-Luc 17, rue Saint Sébastien F-59140 Dunkerque / FR | 02 /
Farda, Henri Allée des Mésanges F-62360 Condettes / FR | 03 /
Graber, Harold 14 rue des Platanes F-59630 Broukerque / FR | 04 /
Menuge, Jacques Rue des Ecoles F-62830 Verlinct Hun / FR | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Paul, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Martin, Jean-Paul, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402380.5 | 29.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | FR19920011782 | 30.09.1992 Original published format: FR 9211782 | [1994/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591052 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C21B7/12 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
C21B7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Einspritzen einer Verschlussmasse in das Stichloch eines metallurgischen Gefässes, wie z.B. Hochofen | [1994/14] | English: | Method for injecting plugging mud into the tap hole of a metallurgical vessel, such as blast furnace | [1994/14] | French: | Procédé d'injection d'une masse de bouchage dans un trou de coulée d'un réacteur métallurgique, tel qu'un haut fourneau | [1994/14] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 19.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60024306 ; | [A]JP02025509 ; | [A]JP63161105 ; | [A]JP03115512 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 138 (C-286)(1861) 13 Juin 1985 & JP-A-60 024 306 ( KAWASAKI SEITETSU ) 7 Février 1985, & JP60024306 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 176 (C-707)(4119) 9 Avril 1990 & JP-A-02 025 509 ( SUMITOMO METAL IND ) 29 Janvier 1990, & JP02025509 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 433 (C-543)(3280) 15 Novembre 1988 & JP-A-63 161 105 ( KAWASAKI REFRACT CO ) 4 Juillet 1988, & JP63161105 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 313 (C-857)9 Août 1991 & JP-A-03 115 512 ( KAWASAKI STEEL ) 16 Mai 1991, & JP03115512 A 00000000 | [A] - REVUE DE METALLURGIE vol. 89, no. 1, Janvier 1992, PARIS FR pages 37 - 44 A.DUFOUR ET AL. | [A] - IRON AND STEEL ENGINEER vol. 67, no. 6, Juin 1990, PITTSBURGH US pages 56 - 61 T.YAMAMOTO ET AL. |