EP0593337 - Apparatus for the fabrication of thermoplastic filament windings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IE | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency F-75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | ||
Former [1994/16] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE 37, Boulevard de Montmorency F-75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fages, Jacques 9, rue Raoul Berton F-93170 Bagnolet / FR | [1994/16] | Representative(s) | Lhuillier, René, et al Lepeudry et Associés 43, rue de la Brèche aux Loups 75012 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | Lhuillier, René, et al Cabinet Lepeudry, 52, avenue Daumesnil F-75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402462.1 | 07.10.1993 | [1994/16] | Priority number, date | FR19920012130 | 12.10.1992 Original published format: FR 9212130 | [1994/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0593337 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0593337 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/84 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
B29C53/8041 (EP);
B29C53/845 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/16] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von thermoplastischen Faserwicklungen | [1994/16] | English: | Apparatus for the fabrication of thermoplastic filament windings | [1994/16] | French: | Dispositif de réalisation d'enroulements filamentaires à matrice thermoplastique | [1994/16] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 03.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.1997 | GR | 23.04.1997 | SE | 23.07.1997 | CH | 31.10.1997 | LI | 31.10.1997 | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
GR | 23.04.1997 | ||
IE | 23.04.1997 | ||
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
CH | 31.10.1997 | ||
LI | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1999/16] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
IE | 23.04.1997 | ||
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
CH | 31.10.1997 | ||
LI | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/50] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
CH | 31.10.1997 | ||
LI | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 23.04.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2107457 (WESTLAND AIRCRAFT LTD) [Y] 1-5 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2421619 (STIEBEL ELTRON GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1-5 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]WO8903761 (LOCTITE CORP [US]) [A] 1-5* figure 3; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0491355 (HERCULES INC [US]) [Y] 1-5 * figure 1; claim 1 * |