EP0599678 - Device for heating of electronic boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dagnac, Pierre Thomson-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie cédex / FR | 02 /
Leviandier, Michel Thomson-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie cédex / FR | 03 /
Tigneres, Jean-Philippe Thomson-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329 F-92402 Courbevoie cédex / FR | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Albert, Claude, et al THALES Intellectual Property 31-33, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | Albert, Claude, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue J.P. Timbaud F-92402 COURBEVOIE CEDEX / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402666.7 | 29.10.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | FR19920012950 | 29.10.1992 Original published format: FR 9212950 | [1994/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599678 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599678 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H05B3/26, H05B3/32 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
H05K7/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/22] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Erwärmung von elektronischen Platten | [1994/22] | English: | Device for heating of electronic boards | [1994/22] | French: | Dispositif de réchauffage de cartes électroniques | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 17.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0484852 (ALCATEL ESPACE [FR]) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 49; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0377425 (ASTURIENNE MINES COMP ROYALE [BE]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]GB1196620 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 9; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0059410 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [A] 1-5,8 * page 7, line 6 - page 8, line 30; figure 2 *; | [A]GB2198593 (FLUKE MFG CO JOHN) [A] 1,7 * page 6, line 20 - page 12, line 4; figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPH0397299 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910716), vol. 015, no. 280, Database accession no. (E - 1090), & JP03097299 A 19910423 (MITSUBISHI) [A] 1,3,8 * abstract * |