EP0601904 - Vehicle navigation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2001 | Revocation of patent | published on 07.03.2001 [2001/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [1998/33] |
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rostan, Hervé 2, rue de l'Eglise F-78500 Sartrouville / FR | 02 /
Deredec, Jean-François 41, boulevard de la République F-92250 La Garenne-Colombes / FR | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Habasque, Etienne J. Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | Habasque, Etienne Joel Jean-François, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402806.9 | 18.11.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | FR19920014960 | 11.12.1992 Original published format: FR 9214960 | [1994/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0601904 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0601904 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
G01C21/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1994/24] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugnavigationssystem | [1994/24] | English: | Vehicle navigation system | [1994/24] | French: | Système de navigation pour véhicule | [1994/24] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 11.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1999
ADMISSIBLE Mannesmann VDO AG Kruppstr. 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | [1999/27] | 22.07.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.11.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.10.2000 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2001/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0346492 (AISIN AW CO LTD ET AL.) [DA] 1 * page 29, line 20 - page 30, line 6 *; | [DA]EP0372840 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [DA] 4 * column 2, line 2 - line 12 * * column 14, line 19 - line 45 *; | [DY] - A.FUCHS ET AL., "EVA-Netzabbildung und Routensuche für ein fahrzeugautonomes Ortungs- und Navigationssystem", NTZ NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, BERLIN DE, (198304), vol. 36, no. 4, pages 220 - 223, XP002048335 [DY] 1,7 * page 221, column M, line 20 - page 222, column M, line 30 * | [Y] - A.G. HOBEIKA, "A Route Guidance System under Modified Network Conditions", VNIS'89 CONFERENCE RECORD, TORONTO, ONTARIO, CA, (19890911), pages 170 - 175, XP002048336 [Y] 1,7 * page 173, column L, line 22 - column D, line 32; figure 5 * | [A] - EUA, Y. ZHAO ET AL., "An adaptive Route-Guidance Algorithm for Intelligent Vehicle Highway Systems", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1991 AMERICAN CONTROL CONFERENCE 26 - 28 JUNE 1991,, BOSTON, MA, US, pages 2568 - 2573, XP002048337 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - T. SAITO ET AL., "Automobile Navigation System Using Beacon Information", VNIS'89 CONFERENCE RECORD 26 - 28 JUIN 1991 1989,, TORONTO, ONTARIO, CA, pages 139 - 145, XP002048338 [A] 1 * page 142, column R, line 21 - line 29 * |