EP0600796 - Radio navigation method and management system for a fleet of vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DASSAULT SERCEL Navigation-Positionnement 16, rue de Bel Air 44470 Carquefou / FR | [1997/02] |
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states SOCIETE D'ETUDES RECHERCHES ET CONSTRUCTIONS ELECTRONIQUES SERCEL 16, rue de Bel-Air F-44470 Carquefou / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rabian, Jean Marcel 19 allée des Loriots F-44980 Sainte Luce / FR | 02 /
Potet, Jean Claude 7 rue des Chênes, Le Petit Bois F-44240 Suce Sur Erdre / FR | 03 /
Guichet, Henri Pierre chemin des Landes F-44690 La Haye Fouassiere / FR | [1997/37] |
Former [1994/46] | 01 /
Rabian, Jean Marcel 19 Allée des Loriots F-44980 Sainte Luce / FR | ||
02 /
Potet, Jean Claude 7 rue des Chênes, Le Petit Bois F-44240 Suce Sur Erdre / FR | |||
03 /
Guichet, Henri Pierre Chemin des Landes F-44690 La Haye Fouassiere / FR | |||
Former [1994/23] | 01 /
Rablan, Jean Marcel 19 Allée des Loriots F-44980 Sainte Luce / FR | ||
02 /
Potet, Jean Claude 7 rue des Chênes, Le Petit Bois F-44240 Suce Sur Erdre / FR | |||
03 /
Guichet, Henri Pierre Chemin des Landes F-44690 La Haye Fouassiere / FR | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402921.6 | 02.12.1993 | [1994/23] | Priority number, date | FR19920014644 | 04.12.1992 Original published format: FR 9214644 | [1994/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0600796 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0600796 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/14 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
G01S5/0009 (EP);
G01S5/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [1994/23] | Title | German: | Funkortungs-Verfahren und Management-System für eine Flotte von Fahrzeugen | [1994/23] | English: | Radio navigation method and management system for a fleet of vehicles | [1994/23] | French: | Procédé de radionavigation et système de gestion de flotte de véhicules | [1994/23] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/49] | 10.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 10.12.1997 | [1998/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]FR2248517 (SOCIETE D'ETUDES, RECH. ET CONSTRUCTIONS ELECTRONIQUES) [YD] 1 * figure 7; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0501828 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3933968 (NIHON MUSEN) [A] * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 16; figure 1 * |