EP0600800 - Procedure and device to acquire an image, in three dimensions, of a small object with a light pencil and a calibration method for such an acquirement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.06.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 30.07.1997 [1997/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peltie, Philippe Villa Vers Le Mont, Saint Paul de Varces F-38760 Varces / FR | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402928.1 | 02.12.1993 | [1994/23] | Priority number, date | FR19920014613 | 04.12.1992 Original published format: FR 9214613 | [1994/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0600800 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24, G01B11/02 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
G01B11/024 (EP);
A61C9/0053 (EP);
A61C9/0093 (EP);
G01B11/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines Bildes, in drei Dimensionen, eines kleines Objekts durch optische Abtastung und ein Kalibrierverfahren für eine solche Herstellung | [1994/23] | English: | Procedure and device to acquire an image, in three dimensions, of a small object with a light pencil and a calibration method for such an acquirement | [1994/23] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'acquisition d'une image à trois dimensions d'un petit objet par palpage lumineux et moyen d'étalonnage pour la mise en oeuvre d'une telle acquisition | [1994/23] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 02.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/31] | 15.03.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0192993 (KAPPNER HELMUT A) [X] 1,3,5,8-11 * column 2, line 42 - column 5, line 38; figures 1,2 * [A] 7 [Y] 1,5; | [XY]US4650335 (ITO TOKUHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * column 2, line 23 - column 2, line 68; figure 1 * * column 3, line 66 - column 6, line 3; figures 2-4 * [Y] 1,5; | [XP]EP0571769 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [XP] 1,4,5,8 * titre *; column 3, line 42 - column 5, line 50; figures 6A-9 *; | [XY]JPS6129709 ; | [A]JPS58165015 | [XAY] - M.ALI KUJOORY, "Real-Time Range and Elevation Finder", PROCEEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, NEW YORK, USA, (198412), vol. 72, no. 12, pages 1821 - 1822 [X] 1,5,8,9 [A] 7 [Y] 1,5 | [XY] - K. YAMATOTO ET AL, "Three-Dimensional Measurement of Dental Cast Profiles and its Applications to Orthodontics", PROC. 12TH ANN. INT. CONF. OF THE IEEE, ENGINEERING IN MEDECINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY, PHILADELPHIA, PENN., USA, (1990), vol. 12, pages 2052 - 2053, XP000238957 [X] 1,3-5,8,9 * page 2052, paragraph 3 - page 2053, paragraph 2; figures 1,3 * [Y] 1,5 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860626), vol. 10, no. 183, Database accession no. (P - 472)<2239> , & JP61029709 A 19860210 (HITACHI ZOSEN CORP.) [X] 1,3,5,10,12 * abstract * [Y] 1,5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831224), vol. 7, no. 290, Database accession no. (P - 245)<1435> , & JP58165015 A 19830930 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |