EP0601925 - Head-up visualization device with image position control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/24] | Image position control device in a head-up visualization device | ||
[1998/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEXTANT Avionique 5-7, rue Jeanne Braconnier Parc Tertiaire 92360 Meudon-la-Forêt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states SEXTANT AVIONIQUE 5-7, rue Jeanne Braconnier Parc Tertiaire F-92360 Meudon-la-Forêt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Francois, Jean-Michel, Thomson-CSF, SCPI BP 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | 02 /
Golia, Michel, Thomson-CSF, SCPI BP 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Benoit, Monique, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | Benoit, Monique, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402952.1 | 07.12.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | FR19920014767 | 08.12.1992 Original published format: FR 9214767 | [1994/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0601925 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0601925 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
G02B27/01 (EP,US);
G02B27/0101 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,US);
G02B2027/014 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0141 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0154 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1994/24] | Title | German: | Head-up Anzeige mit örtlicher Bestimmung des Bildes | [1998/05] | English: | Head-up visualization device with image position control | [1998/05] | French: | Dispositif de visualisation tête haute avec contrôle de position de l'image | [1998/05] |
Former [1994/24] | Vorrichtung zur örtlichen Bestimmung eines Bildes in einer Head-up Anzeige | ||
Former [1994/24] | Image position control device in a head-up visualization device | ||
Former [1994/24] | Dispositif de contrôle de position d'une image dans un dispositif de visualisation tête haute | Examination procedure | 16.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE1932325 (PILKINGTON PERKING ELMER LTD) [Y] 1 * page 4 - page 5; figure . * [A] 5; | [A]US4439755 (LARUSSA JOSEPH A [US]) [A] 2* column 5, line 28 - line 36 *; | [DA]US4775218 (WOOD ROBERT B [US], et al) [DA] 1,2,5 * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 11; figures 1,5 *; | [YA]US4847603 (BLANCHARD CLARK E [US]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 10 - line 40 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 7; figures 1,2 * [A] 5 |