EP0604274 - Communication apparatus having audio response function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morohara, Takayuki, c/o Cannon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Uehara, Shingo, c/o Cannon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/26] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/51] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | ||
Former [1994/26] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93403052.9 | 16.12.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | JP19920342496 | 22.12.1992 Original published format: JP 34249692 | [1994/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0604274 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0604274 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/00 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
H04M1/6505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/26] | Title | German: | Kommunikationsgerät mit Audio-Antwortfunktion | [1994/26] | English: | Communication apparatus having audio response function | [1994/26] | French: | Appareil de communication à fonction de audio-réponse | [1994/26] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43] | Request for further processing for: | 17.05.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.09.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.11.2000 | IT | 02.11.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 02.11.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4958366 (HASHIMOTO) [A] 1-10; | [A]US4866755 (HASHIMOTO) [A] 1-10; | [A]US4916730 (HASHIMOTO) [A] 1-10 |