EP0560698 - Sports shoe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1997 [1997/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROMILES 4, boulevard de Mons 59650 Villeneuve D'Ascq / FR | [1996/42] |
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states DECATHLON PRODUCTION 126, rue Carnot F-59320 Sequedin / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freychat, Philippe 11 rue Hector Berlioz F-69009 Lyon / FR | [1993/37] | Representative(s) | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Immeuble Eurocentre (Euralille) 179 Boulevard de Turin 59777 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 37, rue du Vieux Faubourg F-59800 Lille / FR | ||
Former [1993/37] | Maureau, Bernard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 20, boulevard E. Deruelle B.P. 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93420105.4 | 09.03.1993 | [1993/37] | Priority number, date | FR19920002983 | 09.03.1992 Original published format: FR 9202983 | [1993/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0560698 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0560698 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/14, A43B13/42 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
A43B3/0052 (EP);
A43B13/14 (EP);
A43B13/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [1993/37] | Title | German: | Sportschuh | [1993/37] | English: | Sports shoe | [1993/37] | French: | Chaussure de sport | [1993/37] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 14.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE3927617 (ADIDAS AG [DE]); | [YP]US5187883 (PENNEY RICHARD [US]); | [Y]FR2409714 (UNIROYAL GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US4972609 (OH THOMAS J [US], et al); | [XD]DE3918522 (ADIDAS AG [DE]); | [YD]DE1886439U (SCHALLER JOHANNES [DE]); | [A]EP0399332 (FILA SPORT [IT]) |