Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06161004 | Global Dossier | 07.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US92625192 | 06.08.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0585181 | Global Dossier | 27.07.1994 | A3 | EP0585181 | 02.03.1994 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US92625192 | 06.08.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5284726 | 08.02.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US92625192 | 06.08.1992 |