EP0585181 - Method to determine silver loss in a photographic emulsion manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.12.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 28.01.1998 [1998/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Munch, W. D., C/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Huron, K. E., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Neusch, D. A., c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | Buff, Michel, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | Buff, Michel, et al Kodak-Pathé Département des Brevets et Licences CRT Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 93420316.7 | 23.07.1993 | [1994/09] | Priority number, date | US19920926251 | 06.08.1992 Original published format: US 926251 | [1994/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0585181 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0585181 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N5/00, G03G21/00, G03C1/015 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
G03C1/015 (EP,US);
G01N1/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/09] | G01N5/00, G03G21/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Silberverlustes in einem Herstellungsprozess von photographischen Emulsionen | [1994/09] | English: | Method to determine silver loss in a photographic emulsion manufacturing process | [1994/09] | French: | Procédé de détermination des pertes en Ag lors de la fabrication d'une émulsion photographique | [1994/09] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 24.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/05] | 15.09.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62225929 ; | [A]US4343892 (UENAKA KAZUSHIGE, et al) [A] 1,4,5,8,10 * claim 1 *; | [A]US3704952 (BIRD DOUGLAS) [A] 3,7,10 * column 9, line 25 - column 11, line 20; claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880324), vol. 12, no. 90, Database accession no. (P - 679), & JP62225929 A 00000000 (MITSUBISHI) [A] 1,3-5,7,8,10 * abstract * |