EP0581706 - Fertilizer and process of manufacturing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AFE METAL (Société Anonyme) Boulevard de la Boissonnette F-42110 Feurs / FR | [1994/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Picard, Lyonel 7 rue du 19 Mars 1962 42110 Feurs / FR | 02 /
Mann, Patrick Le Prieuré 26120 La Baume Cornillane / FR | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville B.P. 203 42005 St. Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras, 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville, BP 203 F-42005 St. Etienne Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93420328.2 | 28.07.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | FR19920009729 | 29.07.1992 Original published format: FR 9209729 | [1994/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581706 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C05B5/00, C05D3/04, C05F7/00, C05G1/00, C05D9/00, C05D3/00 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
C05F7/00 (EP);
C05B5/00 (EP);
C05D3/02 (EP);
C05D9/00 (EP);
Y02A40/20 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C05B5/00, C05F7/00 (EP);
C05D3/02, C05D3/04, C05F7/00 (EP);
C05D9/00, C05F7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/05] | Title | German: | Düngemittel und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1994/05] | English: | Fertilizer and process of manufacturing thereof | [1994/05] | French: | Engrais agricole et son procédé de fabrication | [1994/05] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 06.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 04.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/23] | 16.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB212280 (CHRISTIAAN KORNELIS VISSER) [X] 1-4,7,8 * claims 1-8 *; | [XA]US3892553 (GOORDMAN ROBERT V, et al) [X] 1,7,8 * claims 1,12-14 * * column 6, line 53 - column 8, line 32 * [A] 3,4; | [X]DE2536595 (THOMASPHOSPHATFABRIKEN GMBH) [X] 1,3,4,7,8 * claims 1,3 * * example 7 *; | [A]JPS5113678 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 76, no. 12, Database accession no. 7621413X, & JPS5113678 A 19760203 (KUBOTA KK) [A] 1,2,5 * abstract * |