Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0597781
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.12.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] |
13.12.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.01.1997 [1997/05] |
23.10.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.10.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.08.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.08.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.05.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
31.08.1995 |
First examination report |
|
25.04.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] |
31.03.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.05.1994 [1994/20] |