Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0597781 | Global Dossier | 29.01.1997 | B1 | EP0597781 | 18.05.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9213796 | 10.11.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69307834T | 28.05.1997 | T2 | DE69307834D1 | 13.03.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9213796 | 10.11.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2697774 | 23.12.1994 | B1 | FR2697774 | 13.05.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9213796 | 10.11.1992 |