EP0661809 - A buffer stage for use with a current controlled oscillator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni 94250 Gentilly / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni F-94250 Gentilly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sharma, Vivek 2/4, Rue des Jardins de Marquieter F-38120 Le Fontanil / FR | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion F-38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 93420513.9 | 30.12.1993 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0661809 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03K3/03 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
H03K3/0315 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/27] | Title | German: | Pufferstufe zur Verwendung mit einem stromgesteuerten Oszillator | [1995/27] | English: | A buffer stage for use with a current controlled oscillator | [1995/27] | French: | Etage tampon pour usage avec un oscillateur commandé par un courant | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/09] | 23.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/19] | 09.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5175512 (SELF PAUL W [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 64 - column 6, line 15; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5180995 (HAYASHI ISAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 36 - line 48; figure 2 * | [A] - "CMOS ring oscillator with controlled frequency", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., ARMONK(NEW YORK, US), (198807), vol. 31, no. 2, pages 154 - 156 [A] 1 * page 154, line 1 - page 155, line 32; figure 1 * | [A] - SCOTT ET AL., "A 16 Mb/s data detector and timing recovery circuit for token ring LAN", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SOLID STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK US, (198902), vol. 32, doi:doi:10.1109/ISSCC.1989.48237, pages 150 - 151, XP000066864 [A] 1 * page 150, column R, line 5 - line 11; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSCC.1989.48237 |