EP0551240 - Procedure for the control with the help of an optical sensor on a glass ceramics cooking-plate of a kitchen table and optical sensor used therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE POUR L'EQUIPEMENT MENAGER "CEPEM" 18 rue du 11 Octobre F-45140 St Jean-de-la-Ruelle / FR | [1994/20] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states DE DIETRICH EUROPEENNE D'ELECTROMENAGER 57 rue de la Gare F-67580 Mertzwiller / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Darigny, Franck 1 rue de Niederhausbergen F-67200 Mittelhausbergen / FR | [1993/28] | Representative(s) | Benoit, Monique, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | Benoit, Monique, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1994/20] | Chaverneff, Vladimir THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1993/28] | Metz, Paul Cabinet METZ PATNI, 63, rue de la Ganzau F-67100 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 93440002.9 | 11.01.1993 | [1993/28] | Priority number, date | FR19920000273 | 09.01.1992 Original published format: FR 9200273 | [1993/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0551240 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08, H05B3/74, H03K17/94 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
H03K17/14 (EP);
F24C7/082 (EP);
H03K17/9631 (EP);
H05B3/74 (EP);
H03K2217/94026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/28] | Title | German: | Steuerverfahren mit Hilfe eines optischen Detektors an einem Herdteil aus Glaskeramik in einem Küchentisch und dabei verwendeter optischer Detektor | [1993/28] | English: | Procedure for the control with the help of an optical sensor on a glass ceramics cooking-plate of a kitchen table and optical sensor used therefor | [1993/28] | French: | Procédé de commande à l'aide d'un détecteur optique d'un foyer d'une table de cuisson en vitrocéramique et détecteur optique utilisé | [1993/28] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 31.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/43] | 04.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/12] | 30.10.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4034828 ; | [X]EP0446642 ; | [X]FR2621192 ; | [X]GB2161266 | [A] - ELECTRIE vol. 32, no. 4, 1978, BERLIN, DE pages 216 - 217 HASELHOFF 'Zur schaltungstechnischen Realisierung fotoelektrischer Taster' |