EP0575275 - Foldable display unit structure, entirely made from cardboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société PLV DIRECT dite PANKARTE 11 rue du Ried, Nordhouse 67150 Erstein / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states Société PLV DIRECT dite PANKARTE 11 rue du Ried, Nordhouse F-67150 Erstein / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartmann, Michel 69 rue du Maréchal Foch F-67540 Ostwald / FR | [1993/51] | Representative(s) | Metz, Paul Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063 67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Metz, Paul Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063 67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [1993/51] | Metz, Paul Cabinet METZ PATNI, 63, rue de la Ganzau F-67100 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 93440047.4 | 15.06.1993 | [1993/51] | Priority number, date | FR19920007453 | 16.06.1992 Original published format: FR 9207453 | [1993/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575275 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575275 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A47F5/11 | [1993/51] | CPC: |
A47F5/118 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [1993/51] | Title | German: | Klappbare Austellungseinheitsstruktur, insgesamt aus Karton | [1993/51] | English: | Foldable display unit structure, entirely made from cardboard | [1993/51] | French: | Structure pliable de présentoir entièrement en carton | [1993/51] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 07.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.1995 | ES | 20.12.1995 | GB | 20.12.1995 | IT | 20.12.1995 | NL | 20.12.1995 | PT | 20.03.1996 | DE | 21.03.1996 | BE | 30.06.1996 | CH | 30.06.1996 | LI | 30.06.1996 | LU | 30.06.1996 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
ES | 20.12.1995 | ||
GB | 20.12.1995 | ||
IT | 20.12.1995 | ||
PT | 20.03.1996 | ||
DE | 21.03.1996 | ||
BE | 30.06.1996 | ||
CH | 30.06.1996 | ||
LI | 30.06.1996 | ||
LU | 30.06.1996 | ||
Former [2000/07] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
GB | 20.12.1995 | ||
IT | 20.12.1995 | ||
PT | 20.03.1996 | ||
DE | 21.03.1996 | ||
BE | 30.06.1996 | ||
CH | 30.06.1996 | ||
LI | 30.06.1996 | ||
LU | 30.06.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
GB | 20.12.1995 | ||
IT | 20.12.1995 | ||
PT | 20.03.1996 | ||
DE | 21.03.1996 | ||
BE | 30.06.1996 | ||
CH | 30.06.1996 | ||
LI | 30.06.1996 | ||
Former [1998/14] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
GB | 20.12.1995 | ||
PT | 20.03.1996 | ||
DE | 21.03.1996 | ||
BE | 30.06.1996 | ||
CH | 30.06.1996 | ||
LI | 30.06.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
GB | 20.12.1995 | ||
DE | 21.03.1996 | ||
BE | 30.06.1996 | ||
CH | 30.06.1996 | ||
LI | 30.06.1996 | ||
Former [1997/25] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
GB | 20.12.1995 | ||
DE | 21.03.1996 | ||
BE | 30.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
GB | 20.12.1995 | ||
DE | 21.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 20.12.1995 | |
DE | 21.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | DE | 21.03.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1943044 (ABRAHAM STONE); | [A]US3990601 (JOYCE JAMES E); | [A]DE8513468U ; | [A]US5000329 (LUBERTO MICHAEL D [US]) |