EP0645326 - Device for continuous dosing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYPROMAT FRANCE S.A. 15 rue de Travail F-67720 Hoerdt / FR | [1995/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kormann, Robert 45, Rue de la Loire F-67800 Hoenheim / FR | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires 2 rue de Dublin 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, Bureaux Europe, 20, place des Halles F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 93440078.9 | 21.09.1993 | [1995/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0645326 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0645326 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65G65/48 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
B65G65/4809 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, PT [1995/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum kontinuierlichen Dosieren | [1995/13] | English: | Device for continuous dosing | [1995/13] | French: | Système de dosage en continu | [1995/13] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1993 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 05.10.1993 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1994 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 07.06.1995 | GB | 07.06.1995 | NL | 07.06.1995 | PT | 07.09.1995 | DE | 08.09.1995 | BE | 30.09.1995 | CH | 30.09.1995 | LI | 30.09.1995 | LU | 30.09.1995 | [2002/26] |
Former [2000/06] | GB | 07.06.1995 | |
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
PT | 07.09.1995 | ||
DE | 08.09.1995 | ||
BE | 30.09.1995 | ||
CH | 30.09.1995 | ||
LI | 30.09.1995 | ||
LU | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [1998/14] | GB | 07.06.1995 | |
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
PT | 07.09.1995 | ||
DE | 08.09.1995 | ||
BE | 30.09.1995 | ||
CH | 30.09.1995 | ||
LI | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | GB | 07.06.1995 | |
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
DE | 08.09.1995 | ||
BE | 30.09.1995 | ||
CH | 30.09.1995 | ||
LI | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/31] | GB | 07.06.1995 | |
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
DE | 08.09.1995 | ||
BE | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/15] | GB | 07.06.1995 | |
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
DE | 08.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | NL | 07.06.1995 | |
DE | 08.09.1995 | ||
Former [1995/52] | NL | 07.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB543675 (WHELDON) [Y] 1-3,6,8,10 * page 1, line 79 - page 2, line 69; figures 1,3,4 * [A] 7; | [YA]DE617823 (INTERNATIONAL DE LAVAUD) [Y] 1-3,6,8,10 * the whole document * [A] 5,7,9; | [A]DE1272225 (EIRICH) [A] 1-7,11 * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 54; figure - *; | [A]US1679398 (BONNOT LOUIS C) [A] 1,2,4,8-11 * page 1, line 56 - page 2, line 53; figure - *; | [A]WO9104933 (GMUER) [A] 1,2,8-11 * page 7, line 33 - line 34; figures 1,2,4 * |