EP0609636 - Magnetic conditioner for treating liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/32] | Improvements introduced into magnetic conditioners for treating liquids | ||
[1998/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De la Torre Barreiro, José Luis Suiza 4, Bl. 1 1 C E-28224 Pozuelo de Alarcon (Madrid) / ES | [1994/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | Alonso Langle, Emilio Buenavista, 2 28250 Torrelodones (Madrid) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Alonso Langle, Emilio C. Explanada, 8 E-28040 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 93500030.7 | 10.03.1993 | [1994/32] | Priority number, date | ES19930000201 | 04.02.1993 Original published format: ES 9300201 | [1994/32] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609636 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609636 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/48 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
C02F1/481 (EP,US);
F02M27/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT [1994/32] | Title | German: | Magnetischer Konditionierer zur Behandlung von Flüssigkeiten | [1998/21] | English: | Magnetic conditioner for treating liquids | [1998/21] | French: | Conditionneur magnétique destiné au traitement de liquides | [1998/21] |
Former [1994/32] | Verbesserungen, eingeführt in einen magnetischen Konditionierer zur Behandlung von Flüssigkeiten | ||
Former [1994/32] | Improvements introduced into magnetic conditioners for treating liquids | ||
Former [1994/32] | Perfectionnements apportés aux conditionneurs magnétiques destinés au traitement de liquides | Examination procedure | 19.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 10.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.05.1998 | GR | 20.05.1998 | IT | 20.05.1998 | NL | 20.05.1998 | DK | 20.08.1998 | PT | 20.08.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/45] | BE | 20.05.1998 | |
GR | 20.05.1998 | ||
IT | 20.05.1998 | ||
NL | 20.05.1998 | ||
DK | 20.08.1998 | ||
PT | 20.08.1998 | ||
Former [2003/08] | BE | 20.05.1998 | |
GR | 20.05.1998 | ||
IT | 20.05.1998 | ||
NL | 20.05.1998 | ||
PT | 20.08.1998 | ||
Former [2001/23] | BE | 20.05.1998 | |
GR | 20.05.1998 | ||
IT | 20.05.1998 | ||
PT | 20.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 20.05.1998 | |
IT | 20.05.1998 | ||
PT | 20.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 20.05.1998 | |
PT | 20.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 20.05.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT346252B (MACH GUIDO [AT]) [A] 1; | [A]EP0506110 (BOSSERT GERDI [DE])[A] 1 |