EP0591089 - Device for detecting in advance the height of locking latches in installation for changing the gage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.1998 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVESTIGACION Y ASESORAMIENTO TECNICO, S.A.(INVASTESA) Montalban 14 E-28014 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states INVESTIGACION Y ASESORAMIENTO TECNICO, S.A.(INVASTESA) Montalban 14 E-28014 Madrid / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garvia Hierro, Antonio Levante, 6 E-28970 Grinon, Madrid / ES | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto, et al Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel, 21 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto, et al Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21 28010 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [1995/34] | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto, et al Sres. Elzaburu Industrial Property Attorneys Miguel Angel, 21 E-28010 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [1994/14] | Primo de Rivera y Urquijo, Jose Antonio General Martinez Campos, 51 E-28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 93500131.3 | 23.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | ES19920001933 | 30.09.1992 Original published format: ES 9201933 | [1994/14] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591089 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B61F7/00 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
B61F7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur vorzeitigen Ermittlung der Höhe von Verschlussriegeln in einer Einrichtung zur Veränderung der Spurweite | [1994/14] | English: | Device for detecting in advance the height of locking latches in installation for changing the gage | [1994/14] | French: | Dispositif pour détecter d'avance la hauteur des pênes de verrouillage dans une installation pour changer l'écartement | [1994/14] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/47] | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/34] | 30.03.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE729561 (MITTELDEUTSCHE STAHLWERKE AG) [A] 1 * page 3, line 59 - line 75; figures 1,3 * |