EP0560707 - A tieing device made of wire for connecting reinforcing rods for concrete constructions as well as apparatus for use in applying such device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAGENS INDUSTRI A/S Hagensvej 13 DK-9530 Stovring / DK | [1995/20] |
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states HAGENS FJEDRE K/S Hagensvej 13 DK-9530 Stovring / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagens, Peter Hagensvej 13 DK-9530 Stovring / DK | [1993/37] | Representative(s) | Skoett-Jensen, Knud, et al K. Skoett-Jensen Patentingenioerer A/S Lemmingvej 225 8361 Hasselager / DK | [1997/22] |
Former [1993/37] | Pedersen, Soeren Skovgaard c/o K. Skoett-Jensen Patentingenioerer A/S, Lemmingvej 225 DK-8361 Hasselager / DK | Application number, filing date | 93610019.7 | 11.03.1993 | [1993/37] | Priority number, date | DK19920000326 | 11.03.1992 Original published format: DK 32692 | DK19920001128 | 14.09.1992 Original published format: DK 112892 | [1993/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0560707 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0560707 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E04C5/16, E04G21/12 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
E04C5/167 (EP,US);
E04G21/122 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3485 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53478 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53487 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1993/37] | Title | German: | Bindedraht zum Verbinden von Bewehrungsstäbe für Betonkonstruktionen und Vorrichtung zum Einbringen derselben | [1993/37] | English: | A tieing device made of wire for connecting reinforcing rods for concrete constructions as well as apparatus for use in applying such device | [1993/37] | French: | Ligature en fil de fer pour relier des fers d'armature de constructions en béton ainsi qu'un appareil pour appliquer une telle ligature | [1993/37] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 11.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/39] | Request for further processing for: | 01.04.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.10.1998 | BE | 07.10.1998 | ES | 07.10.1998 | FR | 07.10.1998 | GR | 07.10.1998 | IT | 07.10.1998 | NL | 07.10.1998 | PT | 07.01.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 07.10.1998 | |
BE | 07.10.1998 | ||
ES | 07.10.1998 | ||
FR | 07.10.1998 | ||
GR | 07.10.1998 | ||
NL | 07.10.1998 | ||
PT | 07.01.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 07.10.1998 | |
BE | 07.10.1998 | ||
ES | 07.10.1998 | ||
GR | 07.10.1998 | ||
NL | 07.10.1998 | ||
PT | 07.01.1999 | ||
FR | 05.03.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 07.10.1998 | |
BE | 07.10.1998 | ||
ES | 07.10.1998 | ||
GR | 07.10.1998 | ||
PT | 07.01.1999 | ||
FR | 05.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 07.10.1998 | |
BE | 07.10.1998 | ||
GR | 07.10.1998 | ||
PT | 07.01.1999 | ||
FR | 05.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/36] | AT | 07.10.1998 | |
BE | 07.10.1998 | ||
PT | 07.01.1999 | ||
FR | 05.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 07.10.1998 | |
BE | 07.10.1998 | ||
PT | 07.01.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 07.10.1998 | |
PT | 07.01.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE831301 (KARL WALTER EBERSPAECHER); | [A]FR2062587 (SCHROEFBOUTENFABR EVERTS); | [X]FR2161862 (DUCHARME RAYMOND [FR]); | [A]WO9003484 (LEA KARL MAGNE [NO]) |