EP0604359 - Process and system for controlling heating or cooling capacity in heating or air conditioning systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/26] | System for controlling heating or cooling capacity in heating or air conditioning systems | ||
[1998/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bujak, Walter E. Jr. 7 Magnolia Drive Suffield, Connecticut 06078 / US | [1994/26] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al OFFICE DENNEMEYER & ASSOCIATES Sàrl, P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al OFFICE DENNEMEYER & ASSOCIATES Sàrl, P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 93630108.4 | 15.12.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | US19920993558 | 21.12.1992 Original published format: US 993558 | [1994/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0604359 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0604359 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/02, F24F11/08 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
G05D23/20 (EP,US);
F24F11/65 (EP,US);
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F25B49/022 (EP,US);
G05D23/1912 (EP,US);
F24F11/63 (EP,US);
F24F2110/10 (EP,US);
F24F2140/50 (EP,US);
F24F2140/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Steuerung der Heiz- oder Kühlleistung in Heizungs- oder Klimaanlagen | [1998/30] | English: | Process and system for controlling heating or cooling capacity in heating or air conditioning systems | [1998/30] | French: | Procédé et système de contrôle de la capacité de chauffage ou de refroidissement dans les installations de chauffage ou de climatisation | [1998/30] |
Former [1994/26] | System zur Steuerung der Heiz- oder Kühlleistung in Heizungs- oder Klimaanlagen | ||
Former [1994/26] | System for controlling heating or cooling capacity in heating or air conditioning systems | ||
Former [1994/26] | Système de contrôle de la capacité de chauffage ou de refroidissement dans les installations de chauffage ou de climatisation | Examination procedure | 08.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 25.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4487028 (FOYE DAVID M [US]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * abstract; column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 4; column 6, lines 1 - 57; column 7, line 36 - column 8, line 21; column 9, line 1 - column 11, line 58; column 13, lines 1 - 17; figures 1, 5 - 7 * [A] 12-14; | [A]EP0157723 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [A] 1,12 * abstract; page 5, lines 10 - 29; page 7, lines 1 - 11; page 13, line 31 - page 16, line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0194029 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1* abstract; page 7, line 3 - page 9, line 35; figures 1 - 4 *; | [A]EP0253928 (MARGAUX CONTROLS INC [US]) [A] 1,12 * abstract; page 6, line 44 - page 7, line 39; figures 1, 5 - 7 *; | [A]EP0410330 (YORK INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,12 * abstract; column 6, line 44 - column 8, line 54; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0412474 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1,12 * abstract; column 2, lines 10 - 53; column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 9; column 5, lines 7 - 30; figures 1, 2 * |