EP0619990 - Kit for an artificial joint cup, especially an acetabular cup [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer Orthopädie AG Grabenstrasse 25 6340 Baar / CH | [1996/39] |
Former [1994/42] | For all designated states SULZER Medizinaltechnik AG Fröschenweidstrasse 10 CH-8404 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frei, Heribert Geisshofstieg 3 CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [1994/42] | Representative(s) | Trieblnig, Adolf Sulzer Management AG, KS/Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | [1996/39] |
Former [1994/42] | Hammer, Bruno, Dr. c/o Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0007W CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 93810273.8 | 15.04.1993 | [1994/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0619990 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0619990 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/34 | [1994/42] | CPC: |
A61F2/30749 (EP,US);
A61B17/1746 (EP,US);
A61F2/30721 (EP,US);
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61B17/86 (EP,US);
A61B17/8695 (EP,US);
A61F2/30723 (EP,US);
A61F2/4684 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30405 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3054 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30604 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30774 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30787 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3079 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30894 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3401 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3403 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/42] | Title | German: | Bausatz für eine künstliche Gelenkspfanne, insbesondere eine Hüftgelenkspfanne | [1994/42] | English: | Kit for an artificial joint cup, especially an acetabular cup | [1994/42] | French: | Jeu de pièces pour une cupule articulaire artificielle, notamment une cupule acétabulaire | [1994/42] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 31.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Request for further processing for: | 21.07.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 21.07.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.08.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3205526 (MECRON MED PROD GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE3310944 (ERLER FRITZ DR); | [X]EP0314951 (LINK WALDEMAR GMBH CO [DE]); | [A]EP0499475 (SMITH & NEPHEW RICHARDS INC [US]) |