EP0573385 - Bobbin casing with thread tensioning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRITZ GEGAUF AG BERNINA-NÄHMASCHINENFABRIK Seestrasse 8266 Steckborn / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states FRITZ GEGAUF AG BERNINA-NÄHMASCHINENFABRIK Seestrasse CH-8266 Steckborn / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ulmer, Christian Haldenbergstrasse 9 CH-8266 Steckborn / CH | 02 /
WEBER, Peter Graneggstrasse 2 CH-8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | [1995/36] |
Former [1993/49] | 01 /
Ulmer, Christian Haldenbergstrasse 9 CH-8266 Steckborn / CH | Representative(s) | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Patentanwälte Badstrasse 5 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Badstrasse 5 Postfach 323 CH-8501 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 93810350.4 | 12.05.1993 | [1993/49] | Priority number, date | CH19920001784 | 03.06.1992 Original published format: CH 178492 | [1993/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573385 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573385 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D05B63/00, D05B57/26 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
D05B57/26 (EP);
D05B63/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | Spulenkapsel mit Fadenspannvorrichtung | [1993/49] | English: | Bobbin casing with thread tensioning device | [1993/49] | French: | Boîte à canette avec dispositif de tension du fil | [1993/49] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 12.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.09.1995 | GB | 06.09.1995 | SE | 06.12.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1996/30] | GB | 06.09.1995 | |
SE | 06.12.1995 | ||
FR | 02.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/23] | SE | 06.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CH435947 ; | [A]CH569822 |