EP0587532 - Safety release valve for pressure cooker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heinrich Kuhn Metallwarenfabrik Aktiengesellschaft 8486 Rikon im Tösstal / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states Heinrich Kuhn Metallwarenfabrik Aktiengesellschaft 8486 Rikon im Tösstal / CH | ||
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states Heinrich Kuhn Metallwarenfabrik Aktiengesellschaft CH-8486 Rikon im Tösstal / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hüppi, Marcel W. Mettlenstrasse 12c CH-9524 Zuzwil / CH | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 93810604.4 | 25.08.1993 | [1994/11] | Priority number, date | CH19920002718 | 01.09.1992 Original published format: CH 271892 | [1994/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587532 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587532 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A47J27/09 | [1994/11] | CPC: |
A47J27/09 (EP);
F16K37/0033 (EP);
F16K37/0041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/11] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsventil für einen Dampfdruckkochtopf | [1994/11] | English: | Safety release valve for pressure cooker | [1994/11] | French: | Clapet de sécurité pour auto-cuiseur | [1998/12] |
Former [1994/11] | Clapet de sécurité pour auto-cuisseur | Examination procedure | 26.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/21] | 10.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.11.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   18.11.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1116006 (BABCOCK & WILCOX DAMPFKESSELWE) [A] 8,10 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 8; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US3914528 (JOHNSON WENDELL D); | [A]EP0051961 (CROSBY VALVE & GAGE [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 14 - line 21; figure 2 *; | [YA]DE3227245 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4-9,12 * page 5, paragraph 4; figures 4,5 * * page 6, paragraph 6 - page 7, paragraph 2 * [A] 1-3; | [XY]EP0343325 (SILIT WERKE [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 12 - line 38; figure 3 * [Y] 4-9,12; | [A]FR2673261 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,6-9 * page 10, line 19 - page 11, line 2; figure . * |