EP0646408 - Device for homogenising very viscous liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer Chemtech AG Hegifeldstrasse 10, Postfach 65 CH-8404 Winterthur / CH | [1995/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Signer, Arno Salomon Bleuler Weg 14 CH-8400 Wintherthur / CH | [1995/14] | Representative(s) | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0007 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [1995/14] | Hammer, Bruno, Dr. c/o Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0007W CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 93810701.8 | 05.10.1993 | [1995/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0646408 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0646408 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/06 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
B29C45/581 (EP,US);
B01F25/40 (KR);
B01F25/4316 (EP,KR,US);
B01F25/431974 (EP,US);
B29C48/362 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/31] |
Former [1995/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Homogenisieren von hochviskosen Fluiden | [1995/14] | English: | Device for homogenising very viscous liquids | [1995/14] | French: | Dispositif pour homogéniser des liquides très visqueux | [1995/14] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1994 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, GR, IE, LU, MC | 14.09.1995 | Examination requested [1995/45] | 05.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.11.1994 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1994 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1994 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1994 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.11.1994 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 02.03.2000 | [2000/43] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR606324 (SMITH) [X] 1-3; | [A]US2584827 (JAMES BAILEY) [A] 1,10; | [A]FR1319212 (BARMER MASCHINENFABRIK ANTIENG, et al); | [X]DE1807922 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1-3; | [A]CH564966 (SAUTER FR AG FABRIK ELEKTRISCH); | [A]GB2020987 (SULZER AG) [A] 5; | [X]US4747697 (KOJIMA HISAO [JP]) [X] 1,7-9 * column 3, line 59 - column 3, line 66 * | by applicant | - G.SCHNEIDER; R.MAURER, ÖSTERR.KUNSTSTOFF-ZEITSCHRIFT, (1985), pages 86 - 89 | - M.H.PAHL; E.MUSCHELKNAUTZ, CHEM.-ING.-TECH., (1980), vol. 52, pages 285 - 291 |