EP0653219 - Process for producing a hypoxic gaseous mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRADOTEC S.A. Chemin des Coquelicots 16 1214 Vernier / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states TRADOTEC S.A. Chemin des Coquelicots 16 CH-1214 Vernier / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tkatchouk, Elena N. Ul. Delegatskaya 16/1, ap. 134 RU-103473 Moscow / RU | 02 /
Staebler, Regula Chemin des Coquelicots 16 CH-1214 Vernier / CH | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Wenger, Joel-Théophile Griffes Consulting S.A. Route de Florissant 81 1206 Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Wenger, Joel-Théophile c/o Griffes Consulting S.A. Route de Florissant 81 1206 Genève / CH | ||
Former [1995/20] | Charbonnier, Georges R. 8, Avenue Peschier CH-1206 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 93810794.3 | 16.11.1993 | [1995/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0653219 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/22, B01D53/04, A61L9/22, A61M15/02 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
A61L9/22 (EP);
A61M15/02 (EP);
A61M16/22 (EP);
B01D53/04 (EP);
A61M16/1055 (EP);
A61M2230/435 (EP);
B01D2256/10 (EP);
B01D2257/504 (EP);
B01D2259/4533 (EP);
Y02C20/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer hypoxischen Gasmischung | [1995/20] | English: | Process for producing a hypoxic gaseous mixture | [1995/20] | French: | Procédé pour produire un mélange gazeux hypoxique | [1995/20] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 16.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/45] | 16.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.12.1994 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   16.12.1994 | 06.12.1994 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   16.12.1994 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.1996 | 30.11.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.06.1997 | 30.11.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.1998 | 30.11.1999 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5143060 (SMITH CHARLES A [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10 * column A; figures 1,2,6-9 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 33 * * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 64 * [Y] 3-6,9; | [Y]SU568451 ; | [Y]US4671269 (WILP WILLIAM A [US]) [Y] 4-6 * column A; figure 2 * * column 2, line 47 - line 57 *; | [Y]US4188946 (RAYBURN ROBERT L [US], et al) [Y] 9 * column A; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 38 - line 64 * * column 9, line 19 - line 24 *; | [A]US3296491 (TOWNSEND BROWN THOMAS) [A] 5,6 * column 4, line 65 - line 66 * * column 6, line 62 - line 69; figure 13 *; | [A]US3320151 (TEPE CHARLES F, et al) [A] 8 * column 2, line 47 - line 54 *; | [A]EP0472799 (TRADOTEC SA [CH]); | [A]SU950406 ; | [A]SU1768021 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 78, no. 25, Database accession no. 78-45317A, & SU568451 A 19770902 (LENGD AVIATION EQUI ET AL.) [Y] 3 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 26, Database accession no. 83-J6747K, & SU950406 A 19820815 (MOTHER CHILD HEALTH) [A] * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 42, Database accession no. 93-334881, & SU1768021 A 19921007 (UKR LIVESTOCK PHYSIOL BIOCHEM RES INST) [A] * abstract * |