EP0571344 - Device for clamping an exchangeable cutting bit for machining stone-like materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polidori, Cesare Via dell'Isola 55 55010 Lunata Capannori (Lucca) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states Polidori, Cesare Via dell'Isola 55 I-55010 Lunata Capannori (Lucca) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/47] | Representative(s) | Fiammenghi-Domenighetti, Delfina, et al Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi Via Quattro Fontane 31 00184 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | Fiammenghi-Domenighetti, Delfina, et al Fiammenghi-Fiammenghi Via Quattro Fontane 31 I-00184 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 93830216.3 | 20.05.1993 | [1993/47] | Priority number, date | IT1992LU00006U | 21.05.1992 Original published format: IT LU920006 U | [1993/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571344 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/12, B23B27/16 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
B28D1/125 (EP);
B23B27/1666 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Festklemmen eines auswechselbaren Schneideinsatzes zum Bearbeiten von steinartigen Materialien | [1993/47] | English: | Device for clamping an exchangeable cutting bit for machining stone-like materials | [1993/47] | French: | Dispositif de serrage d'une plaquette de coupe interchangeable pour travailler des matériaux pierreux | [1993/47] | File destroyed: | 03.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 25.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/07] | 15.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3673657 ; | [X]FR2342812 ; | [A]EP0028418 ; | [A]US1903771 ; | [A]SU990435 | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED Section PQ, Week 47, 1 January 1984 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class P54AN 83-825378 & SU-A-0 990 435 (SESTRORETSK INSTR) 23 January 1983 |