EP0606051 - Gas electrode, catalyst for gas electrode, and process for production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1997 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PERMELEC ELECTRODE LTD. 2023-15, Endo Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | For all designated states DE NORA PERMELEC S.P.A. Via Bistolfi 35 20134 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states PERMELEC ELECTRODE LTD. 2023-15, Endo Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
For all designated states DE NORA PERMELEC S.P.A. Via Bistolfi 35 I-20134 Milano / IT | |||
Former [1994/28] | For all designated states Permelec Electrode Ltd No. 1159 Ishikawa Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa / JP | ||
For all designated states DE NORA PERMELEC S.P.A. Via Bistolfi 35 I-20134 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimamune, Takayuki 3006-30, Honmachida Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nakajima, Yasuo 4-26-1-401, Minami Ogikubo Suginami-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1994/28] | Representative(s) | Pellegri, Alberto, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Pellegri, Alberto, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Via Puccini, 7 I-21100 Varese / IT | Application number, filing date | 93830517.4 | 22.12.1993 | [1994/28] | Priority number, date | JP19920359077 | 25.12.1992 Original published format: JP 35907792 | JP19930044434 | 10.02.1993 Original published format: JP 4443493 | [1994/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0606051 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/90, H01M4/86, B01J23/52, C25B11/04, H01M8/10 | [1994/28] | CPC: |
H01M4/9083 (EP);
B01J23/52 (EP);
C25B11/04 (EP);
C25B9/23 (EP);
H01M4/86 (EP);
H01M4/90 (EP);
H01M8/1004 (EP);
H01M2300/0082 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/28] | Title | German: | Gaselektrode, katalysator für Gaselektrode und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1994/28] | English: | Gas electrode, catalyst for gas electrode, and process for production thereof | [1994/28] | French: | Electrode à gaz, matière catalytique pour électrode à gaz et procédé de fabrication | [1994/28] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 11.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.01.1997 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9005798 (PHYSICAL SCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,13 * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 18, paragraph 2 * * abstract * [Y] 10,14; | [XY]US4839327 (HARUTA MASATAKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,13 * claims 1,2 * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 15 * * column 3, line 8 - line 40 * [Y] 10,14; | [Y]DE4009111 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP]) [Y] 10,14 * claims 1,5,8 * * page 4, line 4 - line 29 * * page 6, line 29 - line 37 * * example 19 *; | [A]WO8702715 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU]) [A] 4 * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 5; claims 1,2 *; | [A]FR2340769 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 22 - line 28; claims 1,2 * * page 14, line 31 - line 36 *; | [A]FR2624885 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [A] * page 4, line 1 - line 12; claims 1,4 * * page 15, line 23 - line 24 * | [A] - HIROSHI NAKAJIMA ET AL, "METAL ELECTRODES BONDED ON SOLID POLYMER ELECTROLYTE MEMBRANES (SPE)", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA., OXFORD GB, (198701), vol. 32, no. 1, pages 791 - 798 [A] * abstract * |