EP0564430 - A positioning method and positioning arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BT SYSTEMS AB Brodalsvägen 13 S-433 38 Partille / SE | [1994/50] |
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states BT SYSTEMS AB Argongatan 30 S-431 53 Mölndal / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johansson, Lennart Kaprifolgränd 12 S-595 00 Mjölby / SE | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Willquist, Bo Lorentz, et al Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Willquist, Bo, et al Albihn Willquist AB S:t Larsgatan 23 S-582 24 Linköping / SE | ||
Former [1993/40] | Norin, Klas Kooperativa förbundet Patent Department P.O. Box 15200 S-104 65 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 93850061.8 | 30.03.1993 | [1993/40] | Priority number, date | SE19920001074 | 03.04.1992 Original published format: SE 9201074 | [1993/40] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0564430 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/36, B65G1/04 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
G01D5/36 (EP);
B65G1/0421 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/40] | G01D5/36, B65G1/04, G11B21/00, G11B33/14, G11B21/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/40] | Title | German: | Positionierungsverfahren und -vorrichtung | [1993/40] | English: | A positioning method and positioning arrangement | [1993/40] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour positionner | [1993/40] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/20] | 01.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/13] | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP59223602 ; | [A]FR2596514 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 98 (M-375)(1821) 27 April 1985 & JP-A-59 223 602 ( MURATA KIKAI K.K. ) 15 December 1984, & JP59223602 A 19841215 |