EP0568511 - Screen device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.10.1998 [1998/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CelsiusTech Electronics AB 175 88 Järfälla / SE | [1996/29] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states NobelTech Electronics AB S-175 88 Järfälla / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsson, Göran Gösvägen 20 S-175 47 Järfälla / SE | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Falk, Bengt, et al Saab Bofors Support AB Patents and Trademarks 691 80 Karlskoga / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | Falk, Bengt, et al Bofors AB, Patents and Trademarks 691 80 Karlskoga / SE | ||
Former [1993/44] | Falk, Bengt Bofors AB, Patents and Trademarks S-691 80 Karlskoga / SE | Application number, filing date | 93850084.0 | 15.04.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | SE19920001381 | 30.04.1992 Original published format: SE 9201381 | [1993/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0568511 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568511 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q15/00, H01Q1/42 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
H01Q1/425 (EP);
H01Q15/0013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/44] | Title | German: | Schirmvorrichtung | [1993/44] | English: | Screen device | [1993/44] | French: | Dispositif de panneau | [1993/44] | Examination procedure | 26.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/25] | 14.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60210006 ; | [X]EP0468623 ; | [XP]GB2253519 ; | [Y]GB1416343 ; | [A]GB600433 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 58 (E-386)(2115) 7 March 1986 & JP-A-60 210 006 ( FUJITSU ), & JP60210006 A 19860307 |