Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] |
08.09.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.10.1995 [1995/43] |
13.06.1994 | First examination report | |
02.07.1993 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] |
03.06.1993 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] |