Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5492189 | 20.02.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US430093 | 14.01.1993 | US34710194 | 22.11.1994 | AT6192 | 16.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0552140 | Global Dossier | 25.10.1995 | B1 | EP0552140 | 21.07.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT6192 | 16.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATA6192 | 15.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | AT6192 | 16.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE129466T | 15.11.1995 | T1 | Priority number | Date | AT6192 | 16.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59300796D1 | 30.11.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AT6192 | 16.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR970003533B | 20.03.1997 | B1 | KR930016690 | 26.08.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | AT6192 | 16.01.1992 |