EP0568523 - Air conditioning plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.1994 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.1994 | Change - withdrawal | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steiner, Martin Kirlstrasse 7 A-3370 Ybbs/Österreich / AT | [1993/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Kliment, Peter Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Mag.jur. Peter Kliment Singerstrasse 8 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Kliment, Peter Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Mag.jur. Peter Kliment Singerstrasse 8 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 93890089.1 | 29.04.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | AT19920000889 | 30.04.1992 Original published format: AT 88992 | [1993/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0568523 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0568523 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F24F5/00, F24D3/14 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
F24D3/14 (EP);
F24F5/0089 (EP);
F24F5/0092 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/44] | F24F5/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1993/44] | Title | German: | Klimaplatte | [1993/44] | English: | Air conditioning plate | [1993/44] | French: | Plaque de climatisation | [1993/44] | File destroyed: | 23.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 04.01.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4145852 (HAHN GERHARD) [X] 1,2,7,8,10 * column 2, line 10 - line 59; figure 4 * [A] 3-6,9; | [XA]DE3032162 (SCHUH CO GMBH FELIX [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8,10 * page 16, line 34 - page 18, line 19; figure 1 * [A] 2-7,9; | [XA]EP0133631 (DEVON COUNTY COUNCIL [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8 * page 5, line 32 - page 7, line 4; figure 3 * [A] 2,4-6,9,10; | [XA]DE3004562 (BECK EDGAR, et al) [X] 1,8 * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 9; figure . * [A] 2-7,9 |