EP0586365 - Combination of a safety binding for ski jumping with a shoe for ski jumping [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.1995 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.1995 [1995/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aichholzer, Franz Oberallach 7 A-9852 Trebesing / AT | [1994/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Collin, Hans, et al Mariahilferstrasse 50 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Collin, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Dr., et al Mariahilferstrasse 50 A-1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 93890156.8 | 19.08.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | AT19920001700 | 24.08.1992 Original published format: AT 170092 | [1994/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586365 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04, A63C9/20 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
A63C9/02 (EP);
A43B5/0417 (EP);
A43B5/0498 (EP);
A63C2201/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE [1994/10] | Title | German: | Kombination einer Sicherheits-Sprungschibindung mit einem Sprungschuh | [1994/10] | English: | Combination of a safety binding for ski jumping with a shoe for ski jumping | [1994/10] | French: | Combinaison d'une fixation pour ski de saut et d'un chaussure de saut à ski | [1994/10] | File destroyed: | 10.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 10.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/26] | 25.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3412073 (BECK) [Y] 1,4; | [YA]DE1785260 (HOFFMANN) [Y] 1,4 [A] 2,3; | [Y]DE2752491 (HIETALA) [Y] 1,4; | [PA]EP0553468 (SILVRETTA-SHERPAS) [PA] 1; | [A]DE3305117 (DULLEK) |