EP0589864 - Traction vehicle, particularly railway traction vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens SGP Verkehrstechnik GmbH Brehmstrasse 16 1110 Wien / AT | [1997/18] |
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states SGP Verkehrstechnik Gesellschaft m.b.H. Brehmstrasse 16 A-1110 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teichmann, Martin Franckstrasse 14/4 A-8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
Rackl, Hugo, Dipl.-Ing. Kapellenstrasse 81 A-8053 Graz / AT | 03 /
Neurohr, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Holzhaussiedlung 13 A-8302 Nestelbach / AT | 04 /
Haas, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Krausgasse 15/14 A-8020 Graz / AT | 05 /
Hödl, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Sporgasse 22 A-8010 Graz / AT | 06 /
Haigermoser, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing., Dr. St. Peter-Hauptstrasse 29c A-8042 Graz / AT | [1997/28] |
Former [1994/13] | 01 /
Teichmann, Martin Franckstrasse 14/4 A-8010 Graz / AT | ||
02 /
Rackl, Hugo, Dipl.-Ing. Kapellenstrasse 81 A-8053 Graz / AT | |||
03 /
Neurohr, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Holzhaussiedlung 13 A-8302 Nestelbach / AT | |||
04 /
Haas, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Krausgasse 15/14 A-8020 Graz / AT | |||
05 /
Hödl, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Sporgasse 22 A-8010 Graz / AT | |||
06 /
Haigermoser, Andreas, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. St. Peter-Hauptstrasse 29c A-8042 Graz / AT | Representative(s) | Peham, Alois, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Peham, Alois, et al Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/13] | Köhler-Pavlik, Johann, Dipl.-Ing. Margaretenplatz 5 A-1050 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 93890167.5 | 01.09.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | AT19920001876 | 21.09.1992 Original published format: AT 187692 | [1994/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589864 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589864 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B61F3/04, B61C9/50 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
B61C9/50 (EP);
B61F3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, PT [1994/13] | Title | German: | Triebfahrzeug, insbesondere Eisenbahn-Triebfahrzeug | [1994/13] | English: | Traction vehicle, particularly railway traction vehicle | [1994/13] | French: | Automotrice, en particulier automotrice ferroviaire | [1994/13] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/43] | 01.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR355717 (GANZ & CIE, DE FONDERIE ET FABRICATION DE MACHINES [HU]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 49 - line 51; figure - *; | [AD]CH338856 (METALASTIK LTD [GB]); | [AD]DE1089405 (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG); | [DA]DE2650035 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG); | [D]DE2822992 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [Y]FR2426600 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [Y] 4 * page 5, line 22 - line 31; figure - *; | [A]EP0235644 (SCHWEIZERISCHE LOKOMOTIV [CH]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 42; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0444016 (SGP VERKEHRSTECHNIK [AT]) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 33 - line 40; figure - *; | [PXY]DE9214101U (AEG SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE GMBH) [PX] 1-3,5 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 6; figure - * [PY] 4,6 |