EP0603154 - Amperometric enzyme electrode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVL Medical Instruments AG Stettemerstrasse 28 8207 Schaffhausen / CH | [1998/34] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states AVL Medical Instruments AG Stettemerstrasse 28 CH-8207 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Offenbacher, Helmut Dr. Prokesch-Ostengasse 8 A-8020 Graz / AT | 02 /
Marsoner, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Roseggersiedlung 2 A-8151 Steinberg / AT | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Krause, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Babeluk - Krause, Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Krause, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Babeluk - Krause, Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1994/25] | Krause, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Walter Krause, Dipl.-Ing. Peter Kliment, Singerstrasse 8, Postfach 200 A-1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 93890240.0 | 13.12.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | AT19920002485 | 15.12.1992 Original published format: AT 248592 | [1994/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0603154 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0603154 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0603154 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, C12M1/40, // C12Q1/54 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
C12Q1/002 (EP);
C12Q1/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1994/25] | Title | German: | Amperometrische Enzymelektrode | [1994/25] | English: | Amperometric enzyme electrode | [1994/25] | French: | Electrode enzymatique ampérométrique | [1994/25] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/17: Teilanmeldung 96101100.4 eingereicht am 26/01/96 | EPB 1996/17: Divisional application 96101100.4 filed on 26/01/96 | EPB 1996/17: Demande divisionnaire 96101100.4 déposée le 26/01/96 | Examination procedure | 24.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 21.03.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 15.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96101100.4 / EP0711837 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0247850 (CAMBRIDGE LIFE SCIENCES PLC) [YD] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPS59122939 ; | [A]JPS60173452 ; | [AP]AT397661B ; | [E]AT397661B | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 84, no. 34, Database accession no. 84-210584, & JPS59122939 A 19840716 (MATSUSHITA ELEC IND KK) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 42, Database accession no. 85-259794, & JPS60173452 A 19850906 (FUJI ELEC CORP R&D LTD) [A] 6-11 * abstract * | [AP] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 48, Database accession no. 93-377863, & AT397661B B 19940627 (AVL GES VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT & MESSTECHNIK ET AL) [AP] 6-11 * abstract * |