EP0617663 - PLATED STEEL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH Hauptstrasse 150 D-53797 Lohmar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAYER, Jürgen Albstrasse 23 D-7300 Esslingen 1 / DE | 02 /
HALLER, Klaus Dreysestrasse 9C D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | [1994/40] | Representative(s) | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rössler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Frohwitter-Geissler & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, et al Xantener Strasse 12 D-40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 93900100.4 | 16.12.1992 | [1994/40] | WO1992EP02925 | Priority number, date | DE19914141938 | 19.12.1991 Original published format: DE 4141938 | [1994/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9311934 | Date: | 24.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0617663 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0617663 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/01, F01N7/16 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
F01N13/16 (EP,US);
B32B15/011 (EP,US);
F01N2530/26 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12965 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12979 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/40] | Title | German: | PLATTIERTES STAHLBLECH | [1994/40] | English: | PLATED STEEL SHEET | [1994/40] | French: | TOLE D'ACIER PLAQUEE | [1995/46] |
Former [1994/40] | T LE D'ACIER PLAQUEE | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/40] | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2036682 ; | [A]DE1966816 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC); | [A]DE1951141 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC); | [A]GB1190638 (RICHARD THOMAS & BALDWINS LTD [GB], et al); | [A]GB728338 (SUPERIOR STEEL CORP); | [A]US2764805 (MEARS ROBERT B); | [A]US2312582 (PATRICK WILLBUR W); | [A]FR2594732 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]); | [A]GB1443172 (MONMORE TUBES LTD); | [A]DE2126546 ; | [A]US3762884 (GRISAFFE S, et al); | [A]US3640755 (BARTH WALTER J) |