EP0617876 - FIBRE OPTIC TELEPHONE LOOP NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1997 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.1998 [1998/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Corporation World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor Montreal Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEARS, James, A. 3317 Nixon Road Osgoode, Ontario K0A 2W0 / CA | [1994/40] | Representative(s) | Ryan, John Peter William, et al Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group Londond Road Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | Ryan, John Peter William, et al Nortel Limited Patents and Licensing West Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2SH / GB | ||
Former [1995/01] | Ryan, John Peter William Nortel Limited Patents and Licensing West Road Harlow Essex CM20 2SH / GB | ||
Former [1994/40] | Ryan, John Peter William Northern Telecom Europe Limited Patents and Licensing West Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93900139.2 | 17.12.1992 | [1994/40] | WO1992CA00546 | Priority number, date | US19910810067 | 19.12.1991 Original published format: US 810067 | GB19920002353 | 04.02.1992 Original published format: GB 9202353 | [1994/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9312624 | Date: | 24.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0617876 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0617876 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0067 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0001 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/40] | Title | German: | LICHTWELLENLEITER TEILNEHMERLEITUNGS-NETZWERK | [1994/40] | English: | FIBRE OPTIC TELEPHONE LOOP NETWORK | [1994/40] | French: | RESEAU TELEPHONIQUE EN BOUCLE A FIBRES OPTIQUES | [1994/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/40] | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - NEC RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, SPECIAL ISSUE ON ISDN, 1987 TOKYO JP pages 68 - 77 M. SHIMOIDARA ET AL 'Optical Technology for ISDN User Access' | [X] - SCHIFFLER R. A., ET AL., "AN ALTERNATIVE INTERIM SOLUTION ON THE ROAD TO BISDN.", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. INCLUDING SUPERCOMM TECHNICAL SESSIONS. ATLANTA, APR. 15 - 19, 1990., NEW YORK, IEEE., US, US, (19900415), vol. 01 OF 04., pages 01 - 04., XP000147374 | [X] - HASEGAWA T., ET AL., "OPTICAL CUSTOMER ACCESS BASED ON DIGITAL LOOP CARRIER.", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. INCLUDING SUPERCOMM TECHNICAL SESSIONS. ATLANTA, APR. 15 - 19, 1990., NEW YORK, IEEE., US, US, (19900416), vol. 04 OF 04., pages 1550 - 1554., XP000146047 | [Y] - CONFERENCE RECORD, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, 15-19 APRIL 1990, VOL. 4 PAGES 32-34, ATLANTA US J.D. JENSEN ET AL 'Fiber to the Pedestal... Then What?' | [A] - TECHNICAL DIGEST, 11TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, 1-4 OCT. 1985, VOL. 1 PAGES 649-652, VENICE IT S. PENDLETON-HUGHES ET AL 'Forty Channel Wavelength Multiplexing for Short Haul Wideband Communication Networks' | [A] - JOURNAL OF OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS vol. 11, no. 2, June 1990, BERLIN DE L. BERSINER ET AL 'Bidirectional WDM Transmission with Spectrum Sliced LEDs' |