EP0643838 - METHOD FOR THE DETECTION OF ANTIBODIES IN SERONEGATIVE INDIVIDUALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/12] | METHOD AND KIT FOR THE DETECTION OF ANTIBODIES IN SERONEGATIVE INDIVIDUALS | ||
[1999/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shiloov Medical Technologies, Ltd. The Kiryat Weizmann Science Park, P.O. Box 2218 Rehovot 76121 / IL | [1998/39] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states COHEN, Steven J. 1183 Lenox Circle, Northeast Atlanta, GA 30306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Steven, J. 1183 Lenox Circle Northeast Atlanta, GA 30306 / US | 02 /
JEHUDA-COHEN, Tamar 20 Yearot Street Ahoza 347 88 Haifa / IL | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Cabinet Weinstein 56A Rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Cabinet Weinstein, 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/12] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 20, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93900599.7 | 24.11.1992 | [1995/12] | WO1992US10075 | Priority number, date | US19910797730 | 25.11.1991 Original published format: US 797730 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9311435 | Date: | 10.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643838 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643838 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.06.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/569, G01N33/574, G01N33/50 | [1996/08] | CPC: |
G01N33/569 (EP,US);
G01N33/56988 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/12] | G01N33/569, G01N33/574 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE BESTIMMUNG VON ANTIKÖRPERN IN SERONEGATIVEN PERSONEN | [1999/08] | English: | METHOD FOR THE DETECTION OF ANTIBODIES IN SERONEGATIVE INDIVIDUALS | [1999/08] | French: | PROCEDE CONCERNANT LA DETECTION D'ANTICORPS CHEZ DES PERSONNES SERONEGATIVES | [1999/08] |
Former [1995/12] | VERFAHREN UND TESTSATZ FÜR DIE BESTIMMUNG VON ANTIKÖRPERN IN SERONEGATIVEN PERSONEN | ||
Former [1995/12] | METHOD AND KIT FOR THE DETECTION OF ANTIBODIES IN SERONEGATIVE INDIVIDUALS | ||
Former [1995/12] | PROCEDE ET TROUSSE MEDICALE CONCERNANT LA DETECTION D'ANTICORPS CHEZ DES PERSONNES SERONEGATIVES | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.1994 | Search fee paid | 20.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.06.1994 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 03.02.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.05.1995 | 30.11.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.03.1996 | 01.12.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   16.12.1996 | 30.11.1997 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 80, no. 6, Database accession no. 49734, page 434 [A] 1-30 * abstract * | [ ] - M.L. LEROUX ET AL., "A whole blood lymphoproliferation assay for measuring cellular immunity against herpes viruses.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, AMSTERDAM NL, vol. 79, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-1759(85)90105-X, pages 251 - 262, XP023900586 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-1759(85)90105-X | International search | [Y] - Journal of Immunology, Volume 143, Number 7, issued 01 October 1989, ALBERTO AMADORI et al., "HIV-1-Specific B Cell Activation", pages 2146-2152, see entire document. | [Y] - Journal of Clinical Investigation, Volume 78, issued August 1986, ROBERT YARCHOAN et al., "Mechanisms of B Cell Activation in Patients with Acquired Immunodeficiency Syndrome and Related Disorders", pages 439-447, see entire document. | [Y] - Proceedings of the National Academy of the Sciences, Volume 86, issued October 1989, SAVITA PAHWA et al., "In Vitro Synthesis of Human Immunodeficiency Virus-Specific Antibodies in Peripheral Blood Lymphocytes of Infants", pages 7532-7536, see entire document. | [Y] - Proceedings of the National Academy of the Sciences, Volume 87, issued May 1990, TAMAR JEHUDA-COHEN et al., "Polyclonal B-Cell Activation Reveals Antibodies Against Human Immunodeficiency Virus Type 1 (HIV-1) in HIV-1 Seronegative Individuals", pages 3972-3976, see entire document. | [Y] - IVAN ROITT et al., "Immunology", published 1989 by Harper and Row (N.Y.), pages 18.1-18.17 and 24.1-24.10, see entire document. |