EP0615578 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH VARIABLE COMBUSTION CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTIVE HOLDINGS LIMITED P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Roadtown Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states MOTIVE HOLDINGS LIMITED P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Roadtown, Tortola / VG | ||
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states RILEY, Michael B. 1115 Lindenwood Drive Fort Collins, CO 80524 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | ||
Former [1994/38] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93900819.9 | 03.12.1992 | [1994/38] | WO1992US10423 | Priority number, date | US19910800920 | 03.12.1991 Original published format: US 800920 | [1994/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9311350 | Date: | 10.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0615578 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.06.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F02B75/04, F02D15/04 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
F02D13/0234 (EP,US);
F02B41/04 (EP,US);
F02D13/0207 (EP,US);
F02D13/0269 (EP,US);
F02D13/028 (EP,US);
F02D15/04 (EP,US);
F02F1/4214 (EP,US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US);
F02B2075/025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/38] | Title | German: | BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT VARIABLER BRENNKAMMER | [1994/38] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH VARIABLE COMBUSTION CHAMBER | [1994/38] | French: | MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION VARIABLE | [1994/38] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.1994 | Search fee paid | 08.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/37] | 24.04.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/37] | Request for further processing for: | 23.05.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4987863 (DALY PAUL D [US]); | [Y]US4890585 (HATHORN WILLIAM [US]); | [X]US4539946 (HEDELIN LARS G B [SE]); | [A]US5063883 (DINGESS BILLY E [US]); | [A]US4516537 (NAKAHARA MITSUHARU [JP], et al); | [A]US4538569 (SUGINO SHIGEMI [JP], et al); | [A]US4232641 (CURTIL REMI); | [A]US3964452 (NAKAMURA NORIHIKO, et al) |