EP0623109 - METHOD OF PREPARING DIBENZYLAMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEUSTE, Burkhard Sienhardtstra e 38 D-5270 Gummersbach / DE | 02 /
BERGFELD, Manfred August-Pfeffer-Stra e 6 D-8765 Erlenbach / DE | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Fett, Günter, et al CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | Muth, Arno CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Fett, Günter, et al Akzo Patente GmbH, Kasinostrasse 19-21 D-42103 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Muth, Arno, Dipl.-Ing. Akzo Nobel Faser AG Fachbereich Patentwesen Postfach 10 01 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 93901030.2 | 16.12.1992 | [1994/45] | WO1992EP02918 | Priority number, date | DE19914142694 | 21.12.1991 Original published format: DE 4142694 | [1994/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9313047 | Date: | 08.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623109 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/26 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
C07C209/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIBENZYLAMIN | [1994/45] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING DIBENZYLAMINE | [1994/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE DIBENZYLAMINE | [1994/45] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.1994 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 14.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/36] | 07.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3923891 (GREENFIELD HAROLD, et al); | [A]US2217630 (WINANS CHARLES F) | [A] - 'ULMANNS ENCYCLOP[DIE DER TECHNISCHE CHEMIE 4.AUFLAGE; BAND 8' in der Anmeldung erwähnt | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. Bd. 61, 1939, GASTON, PA US Seiten 3566 - 3567 C.F. WINANS 'HYDROGENATION OF ALDEHYDES IN THE PRESENCE OF AMMONIA' in der Anmeldung erwähnt |