Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0625223
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
12.06.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.07.1998 [1998/31] |
20.06.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] |
10.04.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.01.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.10.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.02.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.01.1996 |
First examination report |
|
05.01.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.10.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] |
07.10.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] |