Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0625223 | Global Dossier | 06.08.1997 | B1 | EP0625223 | 23.11.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9103823 | 23.12.1991 | SE9200874 | 17.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69221507T | 18.12.1997 | T2 | DE69221507D1 | 11.09.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | SE9103823 | 23.12.1991 | SE9200874 | 17.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI109302B | 28.06.2002 | B | FI943041 | 23.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9103823 | 23.12.1991 | SE9200874 | 17.12.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9313263 | Global Dossier | 08.07.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9103823 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2752790B | Global Dossier | 18.05.1998 | B2 | JPH07502080 | 02.03.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9103823 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2125047 | 04.11.1997 | C | CA2125047 | 08.07.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE9103823 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE469600 | 02.08.1993 | B | SE9103823L | 24.06.1993 | L | SE9103823D0 | 23.12.1991 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE9103823 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5262011 | 16.11.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | SE9103823 | 23.12.1991 |