EP0573642 - PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING HIGH MAGNETIC FLUX DENSITY GRAIN ORIENTED ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET HAVING SUPERIOR MAGNETIC PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POHANG IRON & STEEL CO., LTD. 1 Geo Dong-dong Kyong Sang Book-Do Pohang-City 790-785 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | For all designated states POHANG IRON & STEEL CO., LTD. 1 Geo Dong-dong Pohang City, Kyong Sang Book-Do 790-300 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jong, Koo Pohang Iron & Steel Co., Ltd. 5 Dong Chon-dong Pohang City Kyong Sang Book-do 790-300 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sung, Jae Pohang Iron & Steel Co., Ltd. 5 Dong Chon-dong Pohang City Kyong Sang Book-do 790-300 / KR | 03 /
YOON, Young, Jin Pohang Iron & Steel Co., Ltd. 5 Dong Chon-dong Pohang City Kyong Sang Book-do 790-300 / KR | [1993/50] | Representative(s) | Götz, Georg Alois Intellectual Property IP-GÖTZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 35 45 90017 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Götz, Georg Alois Intellectual Property IP-GÖTZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 35 45 90017 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1998/20] | Götz, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Götz, Küchler, Dameron Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 93 40 90103 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1995/01] | Matschkur, Götz, Lindner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 91 09 D-90101 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1993/50] | Matschkur, Götz, Lindner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 91 09 D-90101 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93901528.5 | 17.12.1992 | [1993/50] | WO1992KR00078 | Priority number, date | KR19240037591 | 26.12.1991 Original published format: KR 2437591 | [1993/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9313236 | Date: | 08.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573642 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573642 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 08.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/44, C21D8/12, H01F1/16, C22C38/02 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
C21D8/1233 (EP,US);
H01F1/032 (KR);
C22C38/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/50] | C22C38/44, C21D8/12, H01F1/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG KORNORIENTIERTE ELEKTROSTAHLBLECHE MIT HOHER MAGNETISCHER FLUSSDICHTE | [1993/50] | English: | PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING HIGH MAGNETIC FLUX DENSITY GRAIN ORIENTED ELECTRICAL STEEL SHEET HAVING SUPERIOR MAGNETIC PROPERTIES | [1993/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE TOLE D'ACIER MOULE ELECTRIQUE A GRAINS ORIENTES ET A DENSITE ELEVEE DE FLUX MAGNETIQUE, PRESENTANT DES PROPRIETES MAGNETIQUES AMELIOREES | [1993/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 20.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02133525 ; | [A]JPS5511108 ; | [A]US3876476 (MATSUOKA HIDEO, et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 114, No. 20, issued 1991, May 20 (Columbus, Ohio, USA), YOKOCHI, HITOSHI et al., "Manufacture of electric steel strip with grains oriented in thickness direction", page 287, columns 1,2, the Abstract No. 190 154w; & JP,A,02 133 525., & JP02133525 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 93, No. 16, issued 1980, October 20 (Columbus, Ohio, USA), IGUCHI, MASAO et al., "Unidirectional silicon steel sheets", page 243, column 1, the Abstract No. 154 122y; & JP,A,55 011 108., & JP55011108 A 00000000 |