Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0624091
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.01.1998 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] |
02.12.1997 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
26.08.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.01.1997 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
22.01.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.01.1997 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
16.01.1997 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
21.12.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.10.1996 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
26.06.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.03.1996 |
First examination report |
|
14.03.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.09.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] |
30.09.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.11.1994 [1994/46] |