EP0681488 - ELECTRONIC APPARATUS FOR BLOOD TRANSFUSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LE BOEUF, Guy Le Bourg F-86800 Lavoux / FR | [1995/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/46] | Representative(s) | Dawidowicz, Armand Cabinet Dawidowicz 38/40 Allée du Closeau ZI des Richardets 93166 Noisy Le Grand Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/46] | Dawidowicz, Armand Cabinet Dawidowicz, 18, Boulevard Pereire F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93901773.7 | 25.11.1992 | [1995/46] | WO1992FR01098 | Priority number, date | FR19910014940 | 03.12.1991 Original published format: FR 9114940 | [1995/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9310832 | Date: | 10.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0681488 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0681488 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/148 | [1995/46] | CPC: |
A61M5/44 (EP,US);
A61M1/02 (EP);
A61M5/148 (EP);
A61M2005/14513 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, SE [1995/46] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE BLUTTRANSFUSIONSVORRICHTUNG | [1995/46] | English: | ELECTRONIC APPARATUS FOR BLOOD TRANSFUSION | [1995/46] | French: | APPAREIL ELECTRONIQUE POUR LA TRANSFUSION DU SANG | [1995/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.1994 | Examination requested [1995/46] | 30.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.01.1997 | SE | 22.04.1997 | [1998/11] |
Former [1998/05] | GB | 22.01.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3902635 (JINOTTI WALTER J); | [A]EP0019554 (BOEUF LOLA LE [FR]); | [A]US4626243 (SINGH PARAM I [US], et al); | [A]US4747826 (SASSANO JOHN J [US]); | [A]WO8807384 (KANTHAL MEDICAL HEATING AB [SE]) |