Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] |
25.05.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] |
22.11.1994 | First examination report | |
29.07.1994 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] |
29.07.1994 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] |