Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0614439 | Global Dossier | 12.07.1995 | B1 | EP0614439 | 14.09.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9201117 | 01.12.1992 | FR9114915 | 02.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69203459T | 11.04.1996 | T2 | DE69203459D1 | 17.08.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9201117 | 01.12.1992 | FR9114915 | 02.12.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5467902 | 21.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9201117 | 01.12.1992 | FR9114915 | 02.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9311058 | Global Dossier | 10.06.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9114915 | 02.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2074388T | 01.09.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9114915 | 02.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2684358 | 20.01.1995 | B1 | FR2684358 | 04.06.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9114915 | 02.12.1991 |