EP0614439 - SPRAY DEVICE FOR DISPENSING A RELATIVELY HIGH VISCOSITY COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YQUEL, Jean-Pierre 134, rue d'Estienne-d'Orves F-92700 Colombes / FR | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Peuscet, Jacques, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Peuscet, Jacques, et al SCP Cabinet Peuscet et Autres, 68, rue d'Hauteville F-75010 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93901805.7 | 01.12.1992 | [1994/37] | WO1992FR01117 | Priority number, date | FR19910014915 | 02.12.1991 Original published format: FR 9114915 | [1994/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9311058 | Date: | 10.06.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0614439 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0614439 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/32, B65D83/14 | [1994/37] | CPC: |
B65D83/44 (EP,US);
B65D83/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/37] | Title | German: | AEROSOLBEHÄLTER ZUR AUSGABE VON RELATIV HOCHVISKOSEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1994/37] | English: | SPRAY DEVICE FOR DISPENSING A RELATIVELY HIGH VISCOSITY COMPOSITION | [1994/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF AEROSOL POUR DISTRIBUER UNE COMPOSITION A VISCOSITE RELATIVEMENT ELEVEE | [1994/37] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 25.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2837375 (EFFORD JOHN T, et al); | [A]US3541581 (MONSON JAMES A); | [A]US4019657 (SPITZER JOSEPH GEORGE, et al); | [A]DE3037907 (LINDAL GMBH AEROSOL TECH [DE]); | [A]EP0234797 (BESPAK PLC [GB]); | [A]US4853430 (STUEHLER HERBERT [DE], et al) |